Financial history WINTERBORNE KINGSTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 232335
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2004 28/02/2005 28/02/2006 28/02/2007 29/02/2008
Total gross income £2.03k £1.25k £1.20k £1.38k £1.33k
Total expenditure £1.33k £1.30k £1.39k £1.41k £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A