Linked charities INSTITUTION OF THE PRESENTATION NUNS OF MATLOCK (ORDER OF THE PRESENTATION OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY)
Charity number: 232568
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
DEEDS DATED 3/9/1948, 30/11/1954 AND 12/2/1955.
Charitable objects
1. CONVENT OR HOME FOR THE RESIDENCE OF MEMBERS. 2. SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS. 3. CHURCH OR CHAPEL FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP. 4. ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH FALL WITHIN THE PURPOSES OF THE ORDER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 09 June 1964 : Standard registration
- 12 August 1996 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.