Financial history SISTERS OF THE HOLY FAMILY

Charity number: 233108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £809.79k £682.67k £1.05m £750.32k £1.74m
Total expenditure £988.57k £1.56m £882.31k £985.22k £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £227.77k £222.02k £194.40k £194.37k £205.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £582.02k £460.65k £499.33k £527.19k £561.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £351.69k £28.76k £968.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £909.18k £1.48m £792.99k £900.55k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £79.39k £76.42k £89.32k £84.67k £84.27k
Expenditure - Governance £20.70k £21.02k £23.45k £22.50k £25.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £140.60k £830.18k £169.26k £171.06k £95.63k
Expenditure - Investment management £79.39k £76.42k £89.32k £84.67k £84.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0