Financial history EVERGREEN HALL

Charity number: 233402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.81k £29.67k £178 £181 £409
Total expenditure £24.57k £23.16k £10.44k £2.37k £3.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.75k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A