Financial history EYRE CHAPEL FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES

Charity number: 233843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £4.51k £4 £970 £1.68k £1.19k
Total expenditure £1.95k £1.62k £1.84k £2.02k £2.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A