Accounts and annual returns GOLDEN RULE LODGE NO 1261 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 233952
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 18 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 January 2011 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 12 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 12 October 2008 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required