Financial history JOHN FLEETWOOD MARSH

Charity number: 234321
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £20.63k £21.90k £23.45k £27.61k £26
Total expenditure £34.50k £23.90k £47.15k £34.90k £26
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A