Accounts and annual returns ROYTON DISTRICT SICK AND NEEDY FUND

Charity number: 234750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required