Accounts and annual returns THE LADIES LODGE

Charity number: 234810
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 23 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 05 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required