Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN COUPER FUND

Charity Number: 234885
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 February 2012 11 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 February 2012 Not Required
Annual return 11 February 2011 07 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 February 2011 Not Required
Annual return 11 February 2010 14 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 February 2010 Not Required
Annual return 11 February 2009 04 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 February 2009 Not Required