Financial history RICHARD HARVEY

Charity number: 235173
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 19/03/2008
Total gross income £56.16k £16.92k £19.11k £20.14k £20.56k
Total expenditure £21.61k £34.66k £16.32k £30.83k £18.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A