Accounts and annual returns MANSE HELD IN CONNEXION WITH THE FREE CHURCH OF SCOTLAND

Charity number: 235204
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 March 2021 512 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required