Financial history POOR'S LAND AND POOR'S MONEY

Charity Number: 235478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £240 £0 £150 £120 £406
Total expenditure £150 £170 £190 £230 £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A