Financial history CHARITY FOR THE SISTERS OF MERCY MIDHURST

Charity number: 235961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £325.59k £249.32k £824.07k £372.85k £530.70k
Total expenditure £299.37k £268.52k £271.79k £209.00k £261.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £21.03k N/A £200
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £174.58k N/A £418.07k
Income - Other N/A N/A £628.46k N/A £112.43k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £251.33k N/A £241.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £20.45k N/A £19.66k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £16.82k N/A £21.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £20.45k N/A £19.66k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0