Accounts and annual returns SMALL GIFTS OF SUNDRY PERSONS

Charity number: 236089
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 07 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 09 December 2008 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required