Financial history STAND UNITARIAN CHAPEL SUNDAY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 236147
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £7.21k £13.71k £6.67k £8.73k £5.28k
Total expenditure £7.21k £8.68k £5.26k £8.73k £5.28k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A