Financial history SILSDEN AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity Number: 236399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £20.00k £80.00k £20.03k £20.05k
Total expenditure £13.58k £15.22k £40.98k £13.38k £28.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A