Accounts and annual returns D J BIBBY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 236689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2010 21 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 15 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 31 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 31 March 2009 On Time