Accounts and annual returns REVEREND JOHN PHILLIPS

Charity number: 237017
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 December 2024 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required