Accounts and annual returns JOHN FORSTER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 237096
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 12 November 2012 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 08 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required