Trustees THE BRIMPTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 237692
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Dolphin | Chair | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pete Spizzirri | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Daniel Pinnock | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kenny Jones | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Brownlie | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bob Moore | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex Reynolds | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MYCHELLE BASSIL | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carol Phipps | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.