Accounts and annual returns THE ISAAC AND HARRIET JACKSON TRUST FOR CHARITY

Charity number: 237826
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 November 2020 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required