Governing document The Penn and Smith Almshouses

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11 NOV 1955 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07 DEC 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 2024 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE BEING OVER 55 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF GREENWICH AND LEWISHAM FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS PRIOR TO MAKING AN APPLICATION.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GREENWICH AND LEWISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.