Trustees THE CRASTER COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 238380

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Gibson | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Doherty | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Gallon | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chamberlain | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Parker | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Oxley | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cummins | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL MICHAEL CRASTER | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACKIE REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.