Accounts and annual returns THE JOAN AND HELLMUT SOMMER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 238440
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 17 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 10 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required