Financial history THE SOCIETY OF ANALYTICAL PSYCHOLOGY

Charity number: 238441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £427.14k £785.44k £536.44k £551.61k £552.11k
Total expenditure £481.96k £567.95k £575.43k £609.61k £661.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £228.73k £10.23k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £93.55k £110.80k £132.80k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £519.82k £395.89k £405.10k £377.88k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £36.89k £36.78k £35.35k £39.49k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £359 £1.93k
Income - Legacies N/A £228.73k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £555.02k £562.57k £597.52k £649.24k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £12.93k £12.86k £12.09k £12.55k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.45k £3.69k £5.50k £5.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £12.93k £12.86k £12.09k £12.55k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0