Accounts and annual returns MARGARET PHILLIPS

Charity number: 239023
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 01 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2005 Not submitted