Financial history HARRY GREENS CHARITY

Charity Number: 239604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.71k £5.66k £5.47k £5.71k £5.71k
Total expenditure £6.80k £1.34k £2.93k £2.50k £14.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A