Accounts and annual returns THE EMILY PRICE CHARITY

Charity number: 240846
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2006 15 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required