Financial history BLAKEDOWN RECREATION ROOM

Charity number: 240930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.82k £30.67k £5.51k £9.66k £9.03k
Total expenditure £3.41k £27.44k £4.68k £11.73k £8.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.43k £16.10k N/A N/A N/A