Financial history HUGH ABBOT FUND

Charity number: 241193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2019 01/07/2020 01/07/2021 01/07/2022 01/07/2023
Total gross income £138 £140 £147 £140 £172
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A