Financial history THOMAS HENRY ISMAY

Charity number: 241328
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £242 £235 £252 £256 £262
Total expenditure £242 £235 £252 £256 £262
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A