Accounts and annual returns ELIZABETH CAWOOD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 241617
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 19 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required