Financial history RAWMARSH AND PARKGATE AGED PEOPLES CENTRE SCHEME

Charity number: 241643
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £4.57k £3.39k £2.58k £1.59k £655
Total expenditure £8.55k £8.45k £9.97k £8.59k £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A