Accounts and annual returns GEORGIAN THEATRE PRODUCTIONS LTD

Charity number: 241921
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 27 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 29 December 2015 On Time