Financial history THE REVEREND CANON W M HARPER-MITCHELL DECEASED WILL TRUST

Charity number: 242494
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £17.53k £16.81k £16.76k £17.47k £14.42k
Total expenditure £7.52k £8.07k £31.81k £41.74k £25.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A