Linked charities CHARITIES HELD IN CONNECTION WITH WALSGRAVE BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 243218
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1919.
Charitable objects
MANSE AND NEW SCHOOL. HELD UPON THE TRUSTS DECLARED IN THE DEEDS OF 10 AUGUST 1840 AND 16 JULY 1874.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 22 November 1966 : Standard registration
- 08 December 2010 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.