Accounts and annual returns CHARITY KNOWN AS THE PENNY A WEEK FUND TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS FOR DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity number: 243469
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 08 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 21 February 2008 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 05 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 07 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 17 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required