Financial history DAVID ELLIS NANNEY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 243488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £737 £237 £257 £238 £230
Total expenditure £650 £330 £11 £440 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A