Financial history LITTLE MELTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 243883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £16.03k £9.70k £9.38k £8.19k £27.31k
Total expenditure £12.33k £5.84k £7.47k £18.47k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A