Accounts and annual returns OTLEY LADIES SICK VISITING SOCIETY

Charity number: 243951
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 22 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 14 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 27 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 21 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 31 January 2005 On Time