Financial history HITCHIN, LETCHWORTH AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 245059
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £997 £2.80k £11.38k £10.31k £6.14k
Total expenditure £1.90k £2.83k £1.24k £854 £27.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A