Accounts and annual returns O M S INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 245124
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 25 February 2016 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 May 2015 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required