Accounts and annual returns HANNAH CLARKE FOR ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 245212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 February 2022 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required