Charity overview DURNING-LAWRENCE SCHOLARSHIP TRUST
Charity number: 309251-1
Removed charity
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 06/07/1923 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 13/01/1984 AND 26/11/1985
Charitable objects
TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE FOUNDATION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO AID THE HIGHER EDUCATION OF STUDENTS OF THE POLYTECHNIC OF THE SOUTH BANK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 09 October 1984: Standard registration
- 22 March 2000: Removed (Exempt charity)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.