Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF ROBERT GRANTHAM

Charity number: 246024
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required