Financial history WEELEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 246146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.67k £19.44k £28.38k £33.34k £49.21k
Total expenditure £39.57k £16.57k £30.03k £30.20k £46.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.13k N/A £2.80k
Income from government grants N/A £14.83k £8.40k N/A £10.00k