Linked charities DODWORTH PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity Number: 246487
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29 APRIL 1881 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 15 DECEMBER 1893. AS AMENDED ON 26 JUNE 1996 BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF DODWORTH.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF DODWORTH
Registration history
  • 21 January 1966 : Standard registration
  • 26 February 2000 : Removed