Accounts and annual returns ST VINCENTS'S CENTRE-AFFILIATED TO SCOPE

Charity number: 246860
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 February 2009 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 16 February 2009 16 days late
Annual return 05 April 2007 09 April 2008 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 18 February 2008 13 days late
Annual return 05 April 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2005 22 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 22 November 2005 On Time