Financial history PEARSON AND OTHERS' RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 246913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.70k £4.95k £1.77k £1.98k £2.02k
Total expenditure £0 £2.66k £3.26k £959 £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A